OROMO RELIEF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 284602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 November 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 March 2020 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required