Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S MAPLEDURWELL

Charity number: 284649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £40.28k £44.02k £33.65k £37.69k £41.69k
Total expenditure £26.11k £33.79k £37.17k £25.95k £44.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A