Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S SCHOOL - WALWORTH

Charity number: 284721
Charity reporting is overdue by 1691 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £0 £450 £0 £4.86k £0
Total expenditure £0 £450 £0 £3.92k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0