Financial history THE SUNRISE EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 284833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £367.62k £271.80k £254.42k £196.62k £184.19k
Total expenditure £354.05k £292.92k £270.47k £236.76k £169.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £1.00k N/A £57.57k