Trustees PHOENIX HOUSE

Charity number: 284880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Hill Chair 08 December 2022
THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
CRAFTS COUNCIL
Received: On time
Simon Street Trustee 29 September 2022
LEY COMMUNITY DRUG SERVICES
Received: On time
Helen Ruth Wollaston Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Dr Francis Keaney Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
David Nicol Mackie Trustee 28 November 2019
LEY COMMUNITY DRUG SERVICES
Received: On time
IAN WATSON Trustee 12 December 2017
None on record
Dr ANNIE BARTLETT Trustee 23 November 2016
PETAR NETWORK
Received: On time
Emanuele Labovitch Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
Dorothy Marie Brown Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
Iain McGourty Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record