Financial history THE MUDCHUTE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 284907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.43m £1.54m £1.58m £1.47m £1.66m
Total expenditure £1.40m £1.54m £1.60m £1.44m £1.85m
Income from government contracts £31.25k £38.75k £31.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.00k £10.00k £516.06k £181.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £138.01k £196.38k £278.70k £326.55k £748.32k
Income - Other trading activities £196.93k £203.88k £174.13k £26.08k £12.93k
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.05m £1.03m £616.16k £834.57k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £77.98k £86.68k £98.25k £35.79k £65.28k
Income - Other £215 £526 £3.36k £468.07k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.19m £1.27m £1.19m £1.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £277.60k £317.12k £301.01k £226.94k £14.78k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £15.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £35.15k £31.22k £28.25k £23.15k £99.65k