Trustees FOREST OF DEAN CHILDREN'S OPPORTUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 284975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN BURROWS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Donna Boseley | Trustee | 31 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Gadget | Trustee | 31 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Gamlin | Trustee | 31 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Burton | Trustee | 31 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL OVERSBY | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Johanna Warren | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Smith | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Brundett | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Phillips | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MIZEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.