Trustees JUBILEE HALL - LODDON
Charity number: 285015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Thomas Balfour | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Arthur Nicholls Binfield | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Marsham | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Rose Powell | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lesley Sinfield | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Frances Hale | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Williams | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.