THE TAVISTOCK CLINIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 285080
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £537.33k £196.26k £126.73k £26.14k £232.55k
Total expenditure £82.49k £207.10k £136.49k £49.07k £1.34m