AGE CONCERN PORTHLEVEN

Charity number: 285463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.84k £5.13k £4.19k £5.33k £7.58k
Total expenditure £5.26k £5.45k £5.15k £4.63k £4.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A