Financial history THE LUIS PALAU EVANGELISTIC TEAM

Charity number: 285474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £319.08k £386.71k £287.27k £325.26k £316.23k
Total expenditure £329.43k £404.47k £341.15k £270.39k £271.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A