ANSTEY FESTIVAL HALL

Charity number: 285601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.44k £8.86k £8.23k £6.03k £4.54k
Total expenditure £6.10k £8.75k £2.95k £6.93k £3.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A