1ST COMPTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 285980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.65k £22.89k £23.57k £22.64k £37.89k
Total expenditure £18.35k £22.17k £19.50k £23.97k £25.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £225 £225