Governing document KEW COLLEGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 NOV 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JUL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 FEB 2005 as amended on 10 Feb 2020 as amended on 13 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are the advancement of education for the public benefit in particular without limitation by: a) maintaining, carrying on, managing and developing Kew College at Kew, Surrey; and b) acquiring, establishing, maintaining, carrying on, managing and developing, funding and/or supporting such other schools and educational activities; as the trustees shall from time to time think fit (the “Objects”).
Area of benefit
KEW AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.