Accounts and annual returns ST JAMES' CHURCH RESTORATION APPEAL FUND
Charity number: 286085
Charity reporting is overdue by 1278 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 548 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 548 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 913 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 913 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1278 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1278 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 08 March 2020 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window