Governing document MARCH AND DISTRICT MUSEUM SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/11/1982 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/1997 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/2013 as amended on 11 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
(I) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY, INTER ALIA, ENCOURAGING AND DEVELOPING INTEREST IN, AND WIDER KNOWLEDGE OF, THE HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, ECONOMY AND OTHER ACTIVITIES PAST AND PRESENT OF MARCH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (II) (A) TO MAINTAIN A MUSEUM IN THE TOWN OF MARCH WHEREIN TO EXHIBIT ARTEFACTS, DOCUMENTS AND OTHER ITEMS APPROPRIATE TO THIS PURPOSE. (B) TO HOLD MEETINGS, LECTURES AND EXHIBITIONS FROM TIME TO TIME AS THE COMMITTEE MAY DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.