Financial history HEINRICH WOLFGANG DONNER SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 286192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £28.40k £27.59k £17.03k £11.64k £13.87k
Total expenditure £7.64k £52.64k £7.25k £9.17k £42.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A