Trustees THE RUFIJI LEPROSY TRUST
Charity number: 286242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sarah Feather | Chair | 11 July 1998 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Green | Trustee | 21 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER COSGRAVE | Trustee | 21 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin Luxmore | Trustee | 27 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
Mr James Geoffrey O'Donoghue | Trustee | 03 October 2001 |
|
|
||||
Rev Victor Alexander DE WAAL | Trustee | 24 January 1983 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex de Waal OBE | Trustee | 24 January 1983 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.