Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF WIMBORNE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 286478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £26.42k £13.51k £11.45k £10.79k £12.40k
Total expenditure £33.42k £22.19k £14.99k £18.39k £13.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A