DUSTON OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 286498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.76k £10.75k £5.60k £4.96k £3.49k
Total expenditure £5.31k £5.79k £5.71k £4.39k £3.27k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.00k N/A N/A N/A