Financial history EDGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 286621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £660.00k £1.86m £702.00k £824.00k £1.08m
Total expenditure £1.52m £2.56m £4.09m £3.34m £2.17m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £189.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £76.00k £237.00k £426.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £660.00k £639.00k £626.00k £587.00k £649.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.23m £2.33m £2.07m £3.12m £2.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £216.00k £0 £195.00k £80.00k £100.00k
Expenditure - Governance £82.00k £39.00k £30.00k £43.00k £23.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.01m £742.00k £902.00k £155.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £216.00k £0 £195.00k £80.00k £100.00k
Expenditure - Other £82.00k £233.00k £1.83m £144.00k £0