Trustees DARTMOOR RESCUE GROUP
Charity number: 286680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Stoneman | Chair | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Mary Coxon | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Burke | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Lawson Reid OBE | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Kenneth Schofield | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Michael Rose | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martyn John Evans | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Peter Malcolm Vanner Wright | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Marie Godfrey | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Paula Mary-Anne Holbrook | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alec George Collyer MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.