Financial history THE ST JAMES BIDDENHAM TRUST

Charity number: 286767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £28 £18 £35 £42 £18
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A