Financial history 1ST STICKER SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 286931
Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.88k £3.52k £3.33k £20.11k £11.74k
Total expenditure £8.42k £6.13k £6.74k £15.53k £15.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £19.60k £10.67k