Financial history J C J EATON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 286933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £2.97k £2.30k £7.24k £8.63k £11.17k
Total expenditure £1.99k £3.98k £4.75k £3.33k £3.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A