Governing document THE CENTRE FOR ECONOMIC POLICY RESEARCH
Charity number: 287287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MAY 1983 AMENDED 7 JUNE 1983, 13 JANUARY 1996, 8TH SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 12TH DECEMBER 2003. as amended on 27 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE EFFICIENT FUNCTIONING OF THE NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL ECONOMY BY CONDUCTING AND PROMOTING STUDIES AND RESEARCH INTO OPEN ECONOMIES AND THE RELATIONS BETWEEN THEM
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.