THE FRENCH BULLDOG WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 287420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £21.13k £21.38k £6.55k £13.34k £4.09k
Total expenditure £7.74k £17.60k £16.53k £18.71k £3.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A