Governing document THE PETERBOROUGH SOUP KITCHEN
Charity number: 287602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/09/1981 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/1982 AS AMENDED ON 26/07/1994 AS AMENDED ON 11/06/1997 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PETERBOROUGH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PETERBOROUGH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.