Trustees MAIDENHEAD MUSIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 287794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Jones | Chair | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Melanie Joan Fone | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Norris Roscoe | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
PETER GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
William John Fone | Trustee | 25 August 2016 |
|
|||||||
DEBORAH BEHRMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MAVIS GREGSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.