CHINESE ASSOCIATION OF TOWER HAMLETS

Charity number: 287813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £527.03k £433.84k £368.59k £335.35k £385.28k
Total expenditure £454.17k £416.13k £348.98k £297.08k £348.53k
Income from government contracts £401.91k £295.11k £247.88k £196.16k £262.16k
Income from government grants £38.75k £36.22k £25.87k £29.95k £23.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £23.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £503.28k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £84 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £454.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A