Trustees GRAFTY GREEN VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 288091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Thompson | Chair | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bridges | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dann | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Hughes | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Rayner | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Cheney | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janis Carter | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Thompson | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JACQUI THOMPSON | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH BURCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA PILBOROUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT MICHAEL BROUGHTON TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.