Trustees THE HENRY WILLIAMSON SOCIETY
Charity number: 288168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT PAUL WALKER | Chair | 18 April 2012 |
|
|||||
Susan Catherine Cumming | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM RICHARD FOSS | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Crudge | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL McGLONE | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Robert Akeroyd | Trustee | 12 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JEAN GREENING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANN MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.