Governing document SALTERS HILL CHARITY LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/11/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/04/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE ACCOMMODATION EDUCATION, TRAINING, SUPPORT, CARE AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CLIENT GROUP)WHO HAVE LEARNING DISABILITIES AND WHO MAY IN ADDITION HAVE ASSOCIATED PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND/OR SENSORY LOSSES, AND TO RELIEVE THEM IN CASES OF NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.