Financial history THE ATKINSON MORLEY'S HOSPITAL NEUROSCIENCES RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 288438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £49.46k £149.55k £107.75k £139.84k £28.99k
Total expenditure £114.04k £119.07k £129.56k £77.92k £28.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A