Trustees THE CHALLONER'S GIRLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 288443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID PETER PRIEST Chair 12 December 2022
None on record
Peter Hollingsworth Trustee 12 December 2022
None on record
Christine Preston Trustee 08 December 2021
THE ANN BENNETT FUND
Overdue by 14 days
Tymon Broadhead Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
CAROLINE RUSSELL Trustee 01 June 2018
THE ANN BENNETT FUND
Overdue by 14 days
Alan Roe Trustee 01 September 2015
THE ANN BENNETT FUND
Overdue by 14 days