ST MICHAEL'S HOSPICE HASTINGS AND ROTHER

Charity number: 288462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.26m £6.95m £6.89m £7.70m £7.64m
Total expenditure £5.67m £6.61m £6.49m £6.73m £6.70m
Income from government contracts £446.27k £271.21k £307.86k £252.10k £186.42k
Income from government grants £1.88m £2.00m £2.17m £2.15m £2.25m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.13m £2.58m £2.24m £2.80m £2.83m
Income - Other trading activities £1.94m £1.93m £2.07m £2.19m £2.27m
Income - Charitable activities £2.21m £2.30m £2.50m £2.42m £2.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £66.63k £79.34k £74.15k £86.73k £89.77k
Income - Other £905.02k £62.58k £5.22k £198.40k £0
Income - Legacies £2.61m £1.17m £1.50m £2.11m £2.22m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.44m £4.72m £5.15m £5.15m £5.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.18m £1.34m £1.34m £1.33m £1.37m
Expenditure - Governance £50.41k £59.45k £44.88k £69.06k £64.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £50.41k £548.27k £0 £251.34k £0