WHITECHAPEL ART GALLERY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 289122
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1408 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1408 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1773 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1773 days
Annual return 31 March 2015 21 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 24 July 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 08 August 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required