FRIENDS OF ST CLEMENTS

Charity number: 289284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £21.15k £20.99k £23.27k £23.07k £6.89k
Total expenditure £28.31k £11.76k £30.63k £17.72k £6.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A