Trustees THE MIDDLETON CENTRE
Charity number: 289316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger John hall | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
SUSAN BILLINGTON | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Mason | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Read | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Neil Frame | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Frame | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.