Trustees FRIENDS OF THE WILSON, CHELTENHAM ART GALLERY & MUSEUM
Charity number: 289514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Consulota Carmen Price OBE | Chair | 07 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Thomas Rupert Lhoyd-Owen | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Margaret Roberts | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Elizabeth Finlayson | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharina Hoerath | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Isabel Hodsdon | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Christian Graham | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.