Trustees ROYAL NORFOLK AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 289581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Collison Alston | Chair | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emily Norton | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
LAURIE ANGUS JAMES PATERSON HILL | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Spinks | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Richards | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Jonathan Howard Clarke | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Hickling | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Luke Lockhart | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDWARD SAVORY | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.