Trustees HUNSDON PARISH ROOM TRUST
Charity number: 289624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TOM WHYMAN | Chair | 12 March 1984 |
|
|
||||
Judy Walford | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER NICKLIN | Trustee | 02 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE GIBBS | Trustee | 12 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PUMMELL | Trustee | 14 October 2004 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pummell | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.