Trustees THE ORPINGTON ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 289661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Anne Goldsmith | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Allen | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Roberts | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Worthington | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ramsay | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rafal Kaminski | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rose Hopkins | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Sizer | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Alford | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS MEECHAN | Trustee | 11 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.