Trustees AVON VALLEY CONCERTS
Charity number: 289919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV John Richard Turpin MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Radford | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Gillian Margaret Bettle | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Margaret Cox | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Eileen Margaret Lattimer | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Pearson | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Frank MADDOCK | Trustee | 22 August 2011 |
|
|||||
Verity Beatrice Ruecker | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER BETTLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.