Trustees THE BOSHERS ALLOTMENTS AND GARDENERS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 290061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM BURTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Yang Lu | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Stevens | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ballard | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Wildsmith | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Bean | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Baker | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hudson | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Johnson | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emrys Tippett | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.