ST MARY'S SCHOOL ASCOT

Charity number: 290286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £15.11m £15.33m £14.83m £15.99m £15.40m
Total expenditure £13.48m £13.62m £14.46m £15.51m £15.14m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £705.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £805.00k £1.07m £1.42m £392.00k £251.00k
Income - Other trading activities £454.00k £313.00k £354.00k £437.00k £67.00k
Income - Charitable activities £13.83m £13.94m £14.38m £15.15m £14.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.00k £10.00k £8.00k £14.00k £23.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £705.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.37m £13.38m £14.29m £15.38m £15.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £109.00k £127.00k £76.00k £130.00k £62.00k
Expenditure - Governance £23.00k £24.00k £24.00k £19.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £110.00k £102.00k £0 £0