ST MARY'S SCHOOL ASCOT

Charity number: 290286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Joseph McKenna Trustee 09 March 2018 None on record
Clementine Mary Vaughan Trustee 25 November 2015 None on record
Sister Anne Mary Robinson CJ Trustee 25 February 2014 None on record
Rev DERMOT POWER Trustee None on record
Alice Margaret Clementi Trustee 25 May 2021
OPERATION REACH Recently registered
Gordon James Moore Trustee 19 February 2018 None on record
Susannah Lawton Meadway Trustee 17 June 2021 None on record
Annoushka Ayton MBE Trustee 25 February 2014 None on record
Martin Edward Michael Hattrell Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record
Marie Louise Wilson Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record
Christopher Beirne Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
Edward Francis Horswell Trustee 27 November 2014 None on record
The Hon Martin John Hunt Chair 25 February 2014 None on record
Anne Mary Lee Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record