Accounts and annual returns W H PETTY TESTIMONIAL FUND

Charity number: 290499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required