Financial history CANNINGTON COMBINED CHARITY

Charity number: 290789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £3.96k £3.72k £5.35k £4.08k £4.10k
Total expenditure £2.94k £4.08k £2.60k £2.90k £6.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A