Financial history THE FRIENDS OF BROXBOURNE SCHOOL

Charity number: 290886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.62k £2.32k £2.18k £2.20k £629
Total expenditure £1.02k £2.28k £2.85k £353 £4.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A